McCreery, Greig Lyon (CPSO#: 96067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4506
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LHSC University Campus
Division of General Surgery
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 663-3269
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Canada
Phone: (519) 376-2121
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McCreery Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. G. McCreery ( CPSO# 96067 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4506

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3269

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M0
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREIG LYON MCCREERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCREERY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016