McDonald, Christina (CPSO#: 88349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Banyan Youth Services
681 Main St E
Hamilton ON  L8M 1K3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Syl Apps Youth Center
475 Iroquois Shore Rd
Oakville, ON
L6H 1M3
Oakville ON  L6H 1M3
Canada
Phone: 905-844-4110
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christina McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McDonald ( CPSO# 88349 )

Business Address:
McMaster's University Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
681 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1K3
Phone Number: (905) 545-0133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013