McDonald, Maureen Marguerite (CPSO#: 54521)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Medical Centre, 707 Charlotte Street, Peterborough, ON K9J 7B3
Date Received: 31 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018