McDonald, Michael Andrew (CPSO#: 80565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
11th Floor Room 11-PMB-131
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 6805
Fax: (416) 340-4012
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael A. McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McDonald ( CPSO# 80565 )
Dr. J. Johnstone ( CPSO# 80436 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
11th Floor Room 11-PMB-131
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 19 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDREW MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Apr 2004 to 30 Apr 2004
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2007 to 29 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2008