McDowall, Moira Lynne (CPSO#: 60739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
506 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3H7
Phone: (519) 672-5878
Fax: (519) 433-5404
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sidhu McDowall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McDowall ( CPSO# 60739 )
Dr. G. Sidhu ( CPSO# 57687 )

Business Address:
502 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 645-6000

Business Address:
506 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 672-5878

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOIRA LYNNE MCDOWALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDOWALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1990