McEnery, Peter Joseph (CPSO#: 25616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Feb 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3 Cleak Avenue
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone: (613) 332-3305
Fax: (613) 332-0425
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

N H F H T
1 Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Canada
Phone: (613) 332-5692
Fax: (613) 332-5749
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason P. Heavens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. McEnery ( CPSO# 25616 )
Dr. J. Heavens ( CPSO# 71580 )

Business Address:
3 Cleak Avenue
Bancroft ON  K0A 1C0

Business Address:
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings
1 H Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-2825


Corporation Name: Peter McEnery Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. McEnery ( CPSO# 25616 )

Business Address:
3 Cleak Avenue
Box 388
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-3305

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 16 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 16, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter Joseph McEnery
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. McEnery to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                    ("Undertaking") 
                  
                                          of
                  
                              DR. PETER JOSEPH MCENERY
                                    ("Dr. McEnery") 
                  
                                          to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                    (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:
                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. McEnery, certificate of registration number 25616, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that the College received information that
                  raised concerns about my standard of practice in family medicine, I
                  underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The
                  reassessment report received by the College raised additional concerns
                  about my standard of practice in family medicine.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. McEnery, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. McEnery, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for at least twelve (12) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision"), which will cease only upon the approval of the
                        College, as outlined in the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        attached hereto as Appendix "A", the Individualized Education Plan
                        ("IEP") attached hereto as Appendix "B", and as set out below:
                  
                        (i)   Phase 1 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 1")
                  
                              1.    I, Dr. McEnery, undertake to engage in Phase 1 of the
                                    Clinical Supervision for a minimum of three (3) months
                                    on the terms set out below.
                  
                              2.    I, Dr. McEnery, undertake to have an initial meeting
                                    with my Clinical Supervisor to discuss practice
                                    improvement recommendations.
                  
                              3.    During Phase 1, I, Dr. McEnery, undertake to meet with
                                    my Clinical Supervisor no less than once every two (2)
                                    weeks to discuss the Clinical Supervisor's review of:
                  
                                    (i)   all charts for patients to whom I have prescribed
                                          Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                                          Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                                          Substances and All other Monitored Drugs; and
                  
                                    (ii)  fifteen (15) other patient charts, which will
                                          include a mix of charts from my solo and family
                                          health team practices (my "Family Practice").
                  
                              4.    I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will submit written reports to the College
                                    at least once every month, or more frequently if the
                                    Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of
                                    practice or compliance with the terms of this
                                    Undertaking during Phase 1.
                  
                              5.    I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that if, after a minimum of
                                    three (3) months of Phase 1, the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                                    is satisfied that I have the necessary knowledge,
                                    skills and judgment to practice in a less highly
                                    supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor may
                                    recommend to the College that Clinical Supervision be
                                    reduced.
                  
                        (ii)  Phase 2 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 2")
                  
                              1.    Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor and
                                    subject to approval by the College, I, Dr. McEnery,
                                    undertake to engage in Phase 2 of Clinical Supervision
                                    for a minimum of nine (9) months on the terms set out
                                    below.
                  
                              2.    During Phase 2, I, Dr. McEnery, undertake to meet with
                                    my Clinical Supervisor monthly to review:
                  
                                    (i)   fifteen (15) charts for those patients who are
                                          being prescribed Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                                          Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                                          and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                                          Monitored Drugs; and
                  
                                    (ii)  fifteen (15) patient charts from other patients
                                          in my Family Practice.

                              3.    I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will submit quarterly written reports to the
                                    College, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor
                                    has concerns about my standard of practice or
                                    compliance with the terms of this Undertaking during
                                    Phase 2.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that, in addition to the duties set out
                        above, the Clinical Supervisor will, during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision, at minimum:
                  
                        (i)   facilitate the education program set out in the IEP attached
                              as Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (iv)  keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along with patient
                              identifiers.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the reports of the
                        assessor dated November 1, 2017 and January 29, 2018, and concerns
                        that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. McEnery, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. McEnery, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. McEnery, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. McEnery, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

                  (h)   I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. McEnery, undertake that during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision, I shall keep a Log of all prescriptions for Narcotic
                        Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and
                        Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the
                        form attached hereto as Appendix "C", which will include at least
                        the following information (the "Prescribing Log"):
                  
                        (i)   the date of the appointment;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                        (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction,
                              number of tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                        (iv)  the clinical indication;
                        (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or
                              different dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the
                              patient (Y/N);
                        (vi)  my signature;
                        (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review; and
                        (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature.
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. McEnery, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I
                        write for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                        Monitored Drugs, in the corresponding patient chart.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. McEnery, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all elements of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including but not limited to, the following elements
                        of professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Safer
                              Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                              workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                  
                        (ii)  CMPA  Record  Keeping  emodules:  Documentation:Charting
                              Medical RecordseLearningModule(CMPA):https://www.cmpa-
                              acpm.ca/websurvey/userprofile.html?profileType=ela&lang=en&elaRedirect
                              DocumentationCharting/documentation_charting-
                              e.html&referredBy=website&env=www
                  
                        (iii) Documentation II: Principles of Medical Record Keeping
                              eLearning Module
                              (CMPA)https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/websurvey/userprofile.html?profile
                              Type=ela&lang=en&elaRedirect=DocumentationPrinciples/documentation_p
                              rinciples-e.html&referredBy=website
                  
                        (iv)  Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor the following
                              resources:
                  
                              1.    CPSO Policy "Prescribing Drugs":
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-
                                    Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs#Narcotics;
                  
                              2.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Safe and Effective Use of
                                    Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer Pain:
                                    http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/opioid;
                  
                              3.    APA Practice Guideline for the Treatment of Patients
                                    with Major Depressive Disorder:
                                    http://psychiatryonline.org/pb/assets/raw/sitewide/practice_guidelines/
                                    guidelines/mdd.pdf
                  
                              4.    Use in of Antibiotics in Upper Respiratory Tract
                                    Infections: http://www.aafp.org/afp/2012/1101/p817.html
                  
                              5.    Guidance for the use of benzodiazepines in psychiatric
                                    practice:
                                    https://www.ranzcp.org/Files/Resources/College_Statements/Practice_
                                    Guidelines/pg5-pdf.aspx
                  
                              6.    Prescribing and Tapering Benzodiazepines:
                                    http://www.jpshealthnet.
                                    org/sites/default/files/prescribing_and_tapering_benzodiapines.pdf
                  
                              7.    Patient health questionnaire (PHQ-9):
                                    http://www.ubcmood.ca/sad/ PHQ-9.pdf
                  
                              8.    Diabetes Canada: Screening for and Diagnosing Diabetes:
                                    http://guidelines.diabetes.ca/screening; and
                  
                              9.    CPSO  Policy  "Medical  Records":
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-
                                    Publications/Policy/Medical-Records.
                  
                        (v)   any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. McEnery, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. McEnery, undertake to complete this requirement during the
                        period of Clinical Supervision or, if no satisfactory program is
                        available by that time, by the first possible opportunity
                        thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. McEnery, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)"). I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. McEnery, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the terms of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment. I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. McEnery, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. McEnery, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. McEnery, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "D" and Appendix "E",
                        respectively.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              After the College received information that raised concerns
                              about Dr. McEnery's standard of practice in family medicine,
                              Dr. McEnery underwent remediation and submitted to a
                              reassessment of his practice. As a result of the
                              reassessment:
                  
                                    Dr. McEnery will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at
                                    least twelve (12) months.
                  
                                    Dr. McEnery will engage in professional education in
                                    the prescribing of controlled substances, including
                                    narcotics.
                  
                                    Dr. McEnery's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College within six (6) months
                                    of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. McEnery, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until
                  the College determines its terms are satisfied.

            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. McEnery, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. McEnery, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. McEnery, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 16, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Peter Joseph McEnery to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 16, 2018:

After the College received information that raised concerns about Dr. McEnery’s standard of practice in family medicine, Dr. McEnery underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. As a result of the reassessment:

Dr. McEnery will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least twelve (12) months.

Dr. McEnery will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Dr. McEnery’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.