McEvenue, Giancarlo Marcus (CPSO#: 93500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 343
50 burnhamthorpe rd. West
Suite 343
Mississauga ON  L5B3C2
Phone: 9052734888
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giancarlo McEvenue Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. G. McEvenue ( CPSO# 93500 )

Business Address:
Suite 343
50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Phone Number: (905) 273-4888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIANCARLO MARCUS MCEVENUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCEVENUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Oct 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2017