McGee, Allison Jane (CPSO#: 65264)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9th Floor
1240 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 2A7
Phone: (416) 971-7601
Fax: (416) 971-7718
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allison McGee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. McGee ( CPSO# 65264 )

Business Address:
1240 Bay Street
9th Floor
Toronto ON  M5R 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 970-7601

Business Address:
40 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2J3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLISON JANE MCGEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2008