McGhie, John Paul (CPSO#: 82810)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 04 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Sep 2009 to 04 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Sep 2010