McGowan, Thomas Stanley (CPSO#: 57804)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Nov 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.S. McGowan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 31 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Trillium Health Partners, The Credit Valley Hospital, 2200 Eglinton Avenue West, Mississauga, ON, L5M 2N1
Date Received: 08 Aug 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Anguilla
Antigua and Barbuda
Bahamas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS STANLEY MCGOWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGOWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2018