McGregor, Clare-Louise (CPSO#: 79295)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CF Industries
PO Box 1900
161 Bickford Line
Courtright ON  N0N 1H0
Phone: 519-867-2739 Ext. 1266
Fax: 712-294-1140
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: (519) 464-4400
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Dupont - St. Clair River Site
PO Box 40
Corunna ON  N0N 1G0
Canada
Phone: 519-862-6816
Fax: 519-488-1062
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clare-Louise McGregor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 79295 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 646-4400

Business Address:
CF Industries
161 Bickford Line
P O Box 1900
Courtright ON  N0N 1H0
Phone Number: (519) 867-2739

Business Address:
Dupont-St. Clair Rive Site
P O Box 40
Corunna ON  N0N 1G0
Phone Number: (519) 862-5700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLARE-LOUISE MCGREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGREGOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005