McGregor, Tara Ann (CPSO#: 98085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's Family Health Team
Department of Family Medicine
220 Bagot St., PO Bag 8888
Queen's University
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone: (613) 533-9303
Fax: 613-549-0426
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARA ANN MCGREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGREGOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 16 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015