McGuffin, Dominique (CPSO#: 93450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: Braidwood, Dominique (used until: 17 Dec 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOMINIQUE MCGUFFIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGUFFIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015