McGuinty, Caroline Maria (CPSO#: 92781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-4800
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 503
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N2V7
Canada
Phone: 647-477-6151
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Jan 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE MARIA MCGUINTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGUINTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 26 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 13 Jul 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014