McInnes, Matthew Donald Fernand (CPSO#: 76508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Room C159
1053 Carling Rd
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4054
Fax: (613) 761-4476
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McInnes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McInnes ( CPSO# 76508 )
Dr. T. McInnes ( CPSO# 76370 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 761-4054

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW DONALD FERNAND MCINNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINNES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2007