McInnis, James Edward Roland (CPSO#: 81548)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Sep 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
587 River Road West
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 2P2
Phone: (705) 422-0540
Fax: (705) 422-0541
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2 Massey Street, Unit 1
Angus ON  L0M 1B0
Canada
Phone: 705-881-9956
Fax: 705-516-5100
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2011
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2011
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 24 May 2013
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2013
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 14 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 24 May 2013 Active View Details [+]




            As from 11:59 p.m., May 24, 2013, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            James Edward Roland McInnis:

            i)    Dr. McInnis shall conduct all professional encounters with female
                  patients in the presence of a monitor who is a regulated health
                  professional acceptable to the College.  Dr. McInnis shall not be alone
                  with any female patient, for any length of time, during any professional
                  encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian of the patient is also
                  present.

            ii)   Dr. McInnis shall ensure that the monitor shall:

                  a.    provide reports to the College on at least a monthly basis
                        including confirmation regarding Dr. McInnis' compliance with this
                        Order and Dr. McInnis' professionalism with office staff;
                  b.    remain in the examination or consulting room at all times during
                        all professional encounters with all female patients;
                  c.    carefully observe all of Mr. McInnis's physical examinations of all
                        of his female patients including but not limited to internal
                        examinations of female patients;
                  d.    maintain a log of all female patient encounters;
                  e.    initial all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted
                        in the log and
                  f.    submit the original log to the College on a monthly basis.
                  
            iii)  Dr. McInnis shall inform the College of each and every location where he
                  practises including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and
                  office(s), in any jurisdiction within 15 days of commencing practise at
                  that location.

            iv)   Dr. McInnis shall post a sign in his waiting room and in each of his
                  examination rooms, in clearly visible locations that states: "Dr. McInnis
                  may only have encounters with female patients, of any age, in the
                  presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians
                  and Surgeons of Ontario.  Dr. McInnis may not be alone with any female
                  patient unless this practice monitor is present in the examination or
                  consulting room."

            v)    Dr. McInnis shall ensure that all female members of his current office
                  staff review this Order and the Agreed Statement of Facts by no later
                  than May 31, 2013 and shall ensure that, if any new female office staff
                  is hired during a period of two years from the date of this Order, any
                  such staff shall review this Order and the Agreed Statement of Facts
                  prior to starting work for Dr. McInnis








            The Discipline Committee also orders the following additional term and
            condition to be imposed on Dr. McInnis's certificate of registration:

            i)    Dr. McInnis shall continue in psychotherapy with his therapist or a
                  therapist approved by the College, on a regular basis, for a minimum of
                  two years from the date of this Order.  Regular psychotherapy should
                  continue until the therapist recommends, subject to the College's
                  approval, that psychotherapy is no longer required and

            ii)   Dr. McInnis shall ensure that the therapist provides written reports to
                  the College every 3 months for the 2 year period, at Dr. McInnis's
                  expense.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 May 2013
Summary:

On May 24, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. James Edward Roland McInnis 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or 
omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. McInnis 
admitted the allegation. 
 
Dr. McInnis is a family physician. At the time of the incidents described below, Dr. McInnis was 
employed as an emergency physician at Hospital X. The complainant, Nurse A, was a registered 
nurse employed in the emergency department of Hospital X at the time of the incidents. 
 
In February, 2011, Dr. McInnis made repeated flirtatious comments to Nurse A with respect to 
her physical appearance. The comments were made in the presence of other colleagues. Nurse A 
felt uncomfortable as a result of the repeated inappropriate comments. In or around February of 
2011, Dr. McInnis told Nurse A about a nearby coffee shop he liked to attend. Nurse A 
reasonably perceived this as a personal invitation and declined, explaining that she was 
uncomfortable with the invitation. She advised Dr. McInnis that she wanted to maintain a strictly 
physician/nurse relationship.  
 
Nurse A stated that on more than one occasion while giving Nurse A orders to complete on a 
patient, Dr. McInnis put his arm around her shoulder. 
 
On March 6, 2011, during the night shift at approximately midnight, Nurse A bumped into Dr. 
McInnis at a bank machine located in the hospital. As a result of Dr. McInnis' behaviour at the 
bank machine, Nurse A felt very uncomfortable. During their exchange at the bank machine, 
which was depicted on a DVD containing footage from two different hospital surveillance 
cameras, Dr. McInnis reached his left hand towards Nurse A, attempting to place it onto Nurse 
A's forearm. Nurse A moved away from Dr. McInnis so that he could not touch her, making it 
clear that his actions were unwanted. Dr. McInnis left the area, but later returned and continued 
speaking to Nurse A. Dr. McInnis walked straight towards Nurse A, very close to her, placed his 
left hand behind her back, and leaned in towards her, attempting to kiss her. Nurse A turned her 
face away from Dr. McInnis avoiding his approach, once again clearly communicating to him 
that this conduct was unwelcome and uninvited. Despite this, Dr. McInnis then placed his left 
arm around her back, pulling her towards him and kissed her on the left cheek. Nurse A did not 
participate in the half embrace. 
 
The Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
      the Registrar suspend Dr. McInnis's certificate of registration for a period of two (2) 
      months commencing at 12:01 a.m. on June 14, 2013. 
      the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. McInnis's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      i)    Dr. McInnis shall conduct all professional encounters with female patients in the 
            presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the 
            College.  Dr. McInnis shall not be alone with any female patient, for any length 
            of time, during any professional encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian 
            of the patient is also present. 
ii)   Dr. McInnis shall ensure that the monitor shall: 
              
      a.    provide reports to the College on at least a monthly basis including 
            confirmation regarding Dr. McInnis' compliance with this Order and Dr. 
            McInnis' professionalism with office staff; 
      b.    remain in the examination or consulting room at all times during all 
            professional encounters with all female patients; 
      c.    carefully observe all of Mr. McInnis's physical examinations of all of his 
            female patients including but not limited to internal examinations of 
            female patients; 
      d.    maintain a log of all female patient encounters; 
      e.    initial all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted in the log 
            and 
      f.    submit the original log to the College on a monthly basis. 
              
iii)  Dr. McInnis shall inform the College of each and every location where he 
      practises including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any 
      jurisdiction within 15 days of commencing practise at that location. 
              
iv)   Dr. McInnis shall post a sign in his waiting room and in each of his examination 
      rooms, in clearly visible locations that states: "Dr. McInnis may only have 
      encounters with female patients, of any age, in the presence of a practice monitor 
      acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.   Dr. McInnis 
      may not be alone with any female patient unless this practice monitor is present in 
      the examination or consulting room." 
              
v)    Dr. McInnis shall ensure that all female members of his current office staff review 
      this Order and the Agreed Statement of Facts by no later than May 31, 2013 and 
      shall ensure that that, if any new female office staff is hired during a period of two 
      years from the date of this Order, any such staff shall review this Order and the 
      Agreed Statement of Facts prior to starting work for Dr. McInnis.  
              
the Registrar impose the following additional term and condition on Dr. McInnis's 
certificate of registration: 
              
i)    Dr. McInnis shall continue in psychotherapy with his therapist or a therapist 
      approved by the College, on a regular basis, for a minimum of two years from the 
      date of this Order.  Regular psychotherapy should continue until the therapist 
      recommends, subject to the College's approval, that psychotherapy is no longer 
      required and 
ii)   Dr. McInnis shall ensure that the therapist provides written reports to the College 
      every 3 months for the 2 year period, at Dr. McInnis's expense. 
              
Dr. McInnis appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
Dr. McInnis pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within 30 days of the 
date of this Order.  
              
              
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 24, 2013


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Feb 2011
Summary:

 On February 23, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. James Edward Roland McInnis committed 
 an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; and in that he has been found guilty of 
 an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise.

Dr. McInnis' conduct involved 
 boundary violations in the form of inappropriate communications with and conduct towards Patient 
 A, Patient B and a colleague. At a Court Martial held on August 23, 2010, Dr. McInnis pled guilty 
 to two offences of conduct to the prejudice of good order and discipline contrary to s.129 of the 
 National Defence Act, in respect of allegations made by Patient A and Patient B. 

The Discipline 
 Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	Dr. McInnis appear before the panel to be 
 reprimanded.

2.	The Registrar suspend Dr. McInnis' certificate of registration for a period of 
 three (3) months (90 days) commencing at 12:01 a.m. on April 2, 2011.

3.	Dr. McInnis pay to the 
 College costs in the amount of $3650.00 within 60 days of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Wednesday, February 23, 2011