McIntosh, Scott Lochlin Alexander (CPSO#: 86549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Elmwood Family Health Centre
Unit 3
204 First Avenue
St Thomas ON  N5R 4P5
Phone: (519) 631-3223
Fax: (519) 286-0390
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 111
417 Wellington Street
St Thomas ON  N5R5J5
Canada
Phone: 519-631-3223
Fax: 519-286-0390
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott McIntosh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. McIntosh ( CPSO# 86549 )

Business Address:
Elmwood Family Health Centre
3 - 204 First Avenue
St Thomas ON  N5R 4P5
Phone Number: (519) 613-3223

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT LOCHLIN ALEXANDER MCINTOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTOSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2010