McIntyre, Karen Lynne (CPSO#: 73956)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2001 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 18 Nov 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2001 to 10 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2009