McIntyre, Lauralyn Ann (CPSO#: 70069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
P O Box 201B
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73231
Fax: (613) 739-6938
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73231
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. A. McIntyre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. McIntyre ( CPSO# 70069 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
6th Floor
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURALYN ANN MCINTYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTYRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2001