McIntyre, William Finlay (CPSO#: 92940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Arrhythmia Service
McMaster University
Hamilton Health Sciences
30 Birge St
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A6
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 40414
Fax: 905-297-3786
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oxford Health Centre
140 Oxford St
Suite 202
London ON  N6A 5R9
Canada
Phone: 226-785-0460
Fax: 226-785-0466
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM FINLAY MCINTYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTYRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2016