McIsaac, Daniel Ian (CPSO#: 91293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Room B311
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4940
Fax: (613) 761-5331
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel I. McIsaac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. McIsaac ( CPSO# 91293 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Room B302
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4940

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL IAN MCISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCISAAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014