McIsaac, Sarah Mary (CPSO#: 93385)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Anesthesiology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-523-7100
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH MARY MCISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCISAAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 04 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015