McKay, James Stuart (CPSO#: 63475)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
885 Prete St
Sudbury ON  P3E 3X9
Phone: (705) 586-3601
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James McKay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McKay ( CPSO# 63475 )

Business Address:
855 Prete Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3X9
Phone Number: (705) 586-3601


Corporation Name: Dhatt and McKay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McKay ( CPSO# 63475 )
Dr. D. Dhatt ( CPSO# 62637 )

Business Address:
885 Prete Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3X9
Phone Number: (705) 586-3601


Corporation Name: Gauthier McKay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McKay ( CPSO# 63475 )
Dr. M. Gauthier ( CPSO# 30915 )

Business Address:
Unit 205
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 586-3601

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES STUART MCKAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1991