McKay, Robert George Richard (CPSO#: 54075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
3840 Howard Ave
Windsor ON  N9E 3N9
Phone: (519) 969-3744
Fax: (519) 969-4478
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Erie St Clair Clinic
1574 Lincoln Rd
Windsor ON  N8Y 2J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 977-9772
Fax: (519) 977-7145
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Roseville Garden Clinic
100 - 2525 Roseville Gardens Dr
Windsor ON  N8T 3J8
Canada
Phone: (519) 988-1020
Fax: (519) 944-3247
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jaco & McKay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McKay ( CPSO# 54075 )
Dr. J. Jaco ( CPSO# 53936 )

Business Address:
Erie St Clair Clinic
2525 Roseville Gardens Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 3J8
Phone Number: (519) 988-1020

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Site
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 257-5577

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4401

Business Address:
Erie-St. Clair Clinic
1574 Lincoln Road
Windsor ON  N8Y 2J4
Phone Number: (519) 977-9772

Business Address:
South Windsor Medical Centre
Suite 2
3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 3N9
Phone Number: (519) 969-3744

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Sep 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT GEORGE RICHARD MCKAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2017

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 18, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)