McKee, Daniel (CPSO#: 95864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital B3 - 166B
711 Concession street
Hamilton ON  L8V1C3
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 73962
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL MCKEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016