McKeever, Caitlin Dorothy Taylor (CPSO#: 91360)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores
Centre for Mental Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: 905-430-4055
Fax: 905-430-4032
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Caitlin McKeever Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McKeever ( CPSO# 91360 )

Business Address:
Ontario Shores
Building 1-Level 1
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone Number: (905) 668-5881

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAITLIN DOROTHY TAYLOR MCKEEVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKEEVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014