McKelvie, Brianna Lynn (CPSO#: 94825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Pediatric Critical Cre Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55263
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brianna McKelvie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. McKelvie ( CPSO# 94825 )

Business Address:
Pediatric Critical Care Centre
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIANNA LYNN MCKELVIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKELVIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 22 Feb 2011 to 11 Mar 2011
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2012 to 12 Feb 2012
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2015