McLaren, Meaghan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 81543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Primrose Family Medicine 35 Primrose Ave Ottawa, ON K1R 0A1 Mission Clinic 35 Waller St Ottawa, ON K1N 7G4
Date Received: 04 Jun 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories
Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Aug 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEAGHAN ELIZABETH MCLAREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLAREN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 23 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 2004 to 23 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2005