McLaughlin, Christopher Ryan (CPSO#: 97983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
4256 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6E4
Phone: 905-358-6121
Fax: 905-358-1626
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Young St Suite 302
Hamilton
Ontario
L8N 1T8
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Canada
Phone: 905-527-5559
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher McLaughlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mclaughlin ( CPSO# 97983 )

Business Address:
304-4256 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6E4
Phone Number: (905) 358-6121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER RYAN MCLAUGHLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLAUGHLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2017