McLeod, Nancy Lynne (CPSO#: 76819)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 20 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004