McLoone, Mary Bridget Elsie (CPSO#: 80450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-5854
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. McLoone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McLoone ( CPSO# 80450 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5071

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY BRIDGET ELSIE MCLOONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLOONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Feb 2004 to 09 Apr 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014