McMillan, Hugh John (CPSO#: 74914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hosp of Eastern Ontario
Division of Neurology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 1605
Fax: (613) 738-4297
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hugh John McMillan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. McMillan ( CPSO# 74914 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Neurology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUGH JOHN MCMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004