McMillan, John Kenneth (CPSO#: 86985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Musicians' Clinics of Canada
Sir William Osler Health Institute
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 201
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone: (905) 574-5444
Fax: (905) 574-1119
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Musicians' Clinics of Canada
340 College Street
Suite 340
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN KENNETH MCMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2011