McMullen, Michael Christopher (CPSO#: 79939)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Center
Department of Anesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Canada
Phone: (613) 546-1101
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Kingston Health Sciences Center HDH
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3310
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael C. McMullen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Suite Victory 2
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7


Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )
Dr. J. Dion ( CPSO# 88602 )
Dr. C. Haley ( CPSO# 104664)
Dr. D. Sydor ( CPSO# 82811 )
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )
Dr. J. Van Vlymen ( CPSO# 62179 )
Dr. K. Turner ( CPSO# 55360 )
Dr. R. Tanzola ( CPSO# 76158 )
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )
Dr. D. Mark ( CPSO# 59595 )
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 52926 )
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )
Dr. S. Haley ( CPSO# 50665 )
Dr. I. Gilron ( CPSO# 62229 )
Dr. M. Fleming ( CPSO# 71251 )
Dr. J. Erb ( CPSO# 79144 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )
Dr. R. Allard ( CPSO# 85022 )
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. G. Mizubuti ( CPSO# 101768)
Dr. G. Klar ( CPSO# 111507)

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER MCMULLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMULLEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Jul 2003 to 06 Aug 2003
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2007