McMullen, William Randall (CPSO#: 32384)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.R. McMullen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. McMullen ( CPSO# 32384 )

Business Address:
130 - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 279-9397

Medical Records Location

Address: Inquiries for medical records can be sent to: drwmcmullen@gmail.com
Date Received: 19 Jul 2018


Instructions: Patients may submit their medical record request to: drwmcmullen@gmail.com. Any patients who would like to access their hospital records may contact the Trillium Health Centre in Mississauga, Ontario.
Date Received: 10 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 01 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2018