McMurren, Chase Everett (CPSO#: 95217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PrimaryCare@Home Program
Taddle Creek Family Health Team
790 Bay Street, Suite 302
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 585-9555
Fax: (416) 585-5815
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Artists' Health Centre
Toronto Western Hospital
3rd Floor, West Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5263
Fax: (416) 603-5821
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Office of the Chief Coroner
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Canada
Phone: (437) 887-5500
Fax: (437) 887-5500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.E. McMurren Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McMurren ( CPSO# 95217 )

Business Address:
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 314-4000

Business Address:
Primarycare@Home Program
Taddle Creek Family Health Team
Suite 302
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 585-9555

Business Address:
Artists' Health Centre
Toronto Western Hospital
3rd Floor West Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHASE EVERETT MCMURREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMURREN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013