McNally, Edward Anthony (CPSO#: 96884)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
220 Bagot St
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone: (613) 533-9303
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shalini Sharma and Edward McNally Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma ( CPSO# 94513 )
Dr. E. McNally ( CPSO# 96884 )

Business Address:
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD ANTHONY MCNALLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNALLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 25 Oct 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 17 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 22 Oct 2013 to 07 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2014