McNamara, George Patrick (CPSO#: 28050)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 352 West Shore Dr Tiny, ON L9M 0M7
Date Received: 16 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018