McNamara, Laura Ann (CPSO#: 63608)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital Corporation
Kitchener Waterloo Health Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: 5197494300
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's General
Hospital Kitchener
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura McNamara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. McNamara ( CPSO# 63608 )

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 376-2923

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital Corporation
Kitchener Waterloo Health Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 376-2923

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA ANN MCNAMARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAMARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1993