McNamara, Patrick Joseph (CPSO#: 77035)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gaelic

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Hospital For Sick Children 555 University Ave Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 22 May 2018

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Aug 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018