McNaughton, Deborah Ann (CPSO#: 31526)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: Waters, Deborah Ann (used until: 24 Sep 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
69 Main Street East
Grand Bend ON  N0M 1T0
Phone: (519) 238-2362
Fax: (519) 238-6478
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

122 King Street
Hensall ON  N0M 1X0
Canada
Phone: (519) 262-3140
Fax: (519) 262-2448
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Queensway Nursing Home
100 Queen St
Hensall ON  N0M 1X0
Canada
Phone: 519-262-2830
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah A. McNaughton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. McNaughton ( CPSO# 31526 )

Business Address:
69 Main Street East
Grand Bend ON  N0M 1T0
Phone Number: (519) 238-2362

Business Address:
122 King Street
Hensall ON  N0M 1X0
Phone Number: (519) 262-3140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Huron Hospital Exeter

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH ANN MCNAUGHTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAUGHTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1980