McNaull, Benjamin Brian Alexander (CPSO#: 93981)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: (705) 326-7727
Fax: (705) 326-1534
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Canada
Phone: (705) 325-2201
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McNaull Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. McNaull ( CPSO# 93981 )
Dr. M. McNaull ( CPSO# 94112 )

Business Address:
Couchiching Family Health Team
Suite 104
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 326-7727

Business Address:
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN BRIAN ALEXANDER MCNAULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAULL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Jul 2010
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 20 Sep 2010 to 05 Nov 2010
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2012