McNaull, Margaret Elizabeth (CPSO#: 94112)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104C
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: (705) 326-7727
Fax: (705) 326-1534
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McNaull Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McNaull ( CPSO# 94112 )
Dr. B. McNaull ( CPSO# 93981 )

Business Address:
Couchiching Family Health Team
Suite 104
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 326-7727

Business Address:
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET ELIZABETH MCNAULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAULL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Jul 2010
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 20 Sep 2010 to 05 Nov 2010
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2011