McNeill, David Gregory (CPSO#: 62691)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental
Health Sciences
Medical Clinic
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 668-5881 Ext. 5475
Fax: (905) 430-4013
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CMHA
60 Bond St. W.
Oshawa ON  L1G 1A5
Canada
Phone: (905) 436-9945
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathryn Drury Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Drury ( CPSO# 69381 )
Dr. D. McNeill ( CPSO# 62691 )

Business Address:
Ontario Shores
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
McKenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angelina Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hsopital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6

Business Address:
CMHA
60 Bond Street West
Oshawa ON  L1G 1A5

Business Address:
Brooklin Medical Centre
5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin ON  L1M 2E9
Phone Number: (905) 655-3321

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GREGORY MCNEILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNEILL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1991