McPhedran, Amy Marie (CPSO#: 76604)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Guelph
Student Health Services
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone: (519) 824-4120 Ext. 52131
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY MARIE MCPHEDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCPHEDRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 04 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2003