McPherson, Terrence Patrick (CPSO#: 82632)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
London ON  N6G 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3990
Fax: 519-434-3278
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Terrence McPherson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. McPherson ( CPSO# 82632 )

Business Address:
University Hospital
6th Floor
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERRENCE PATRICK MCPHERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCPHERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 06 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2016