McRae, Matthew Christian J (CPSO#: 91280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Yale University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Surgery
50 Charlton Ave E, G 845
Hamilton ON  L8N4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 36092
Fax: 905-521-6156
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew McRae Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McRae ( CPSO# 91280 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Surgery
Mary Grace Wing G-845
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (647) 863-0980

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  K3M 4J5
Phone Number: (905) 573-4823

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 389-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW CHRISTIAN J MCRAE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCRAE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2015