McRae, Simon John (CPSO#: 78944)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Tasmania, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 07 Apr 2003 to 30 May 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 31 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 2005