McRedmond, Brian Patrick (CPSO#: 85729)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 21 Dec 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007