Mcilraith, Ian Peter (CPSO#: 74984)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph's Health Care Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6208
Fax: (519) 646-6412
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian McIlraith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Mcilraith ( CPSO# 74984 )

Business Address:
Ivey Eye Institute
St. Joseph's Health Care Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6208

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN PETER MCILRAITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCILRAITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005